This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 08/21/2023 at 13:33:28 (UTC).

North Mill vs. Whatley-Dustin

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 North Mill filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Whatley-Dustin. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CUBC

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North Mill Equipment Finance LLC

Defendants

Dr Whatley Health and Wellness Corp

Whatley Dustin Physician Services

Whatley Dustin, Sara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ito, Ken I

Defendant Attorney

Vanarelli, Christina

 

Court Documents

Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Hearings on Applications for Writ of Possession and Turn Over Order; Filed by: North Mill Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

03/21/2023: Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Hearings on Applications for Writ of Possession and Turn Over Order; Filed by: North Mill Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

Notice of Continuance; Generated by: Court

06/26/2023: Notice of Continuance; Generated by: Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Status: Rescheduled; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice; Result: On 06/26/2023, Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 01/08/2024 8:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show CauseRe Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to FileProof of Service/Default; 02/19/2024 Department 22B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; 02/19/2024 Department 22B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Generated by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketCourt Order scheduled for 02/19/2024 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court at 01/08/2024 8:15 AM Court Order in Department 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingName: Application for Right to Attach Order/Writ of Attachment as to Dr Whatley Health and Wellness Corp; Status: Vacated; Department: Dept 20 / Hall of Justice; Result: Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingName: Application for Right to Attach Order/Writ of Attachment as to Whatley Dustin Physician Services; Status: Vacated; Department: Dept 20 / Hall of Justice; Result: Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingName: Application for Right to Attach Order/Writ of Attachment as tp Sara Whatley Dustin; Status: Vacated; Department: Dept 20 / Hall of Justice; Result: Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Hearings on Applications for Writ of Possession and Turn Over Order; Filed by: North Mill Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCourt Order scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 08:20 AM in at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketApplication - Other (for Writ of Possession After Hearing) filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketApplication - Other (for Writ of Possession After Hearing) filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketApplication - Other (for Writ of Possession After Hearing) filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/19/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 12/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by North Mill Equipment Finance LLC on 12/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less