This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 07:19:40 (UTC).

Nidhi Gulecha vs. Satheesh Balusamy

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Nidhi Gulecha filed an Other lawsuit against Satheesh Balusamy. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gulecha, Nidhi

Defendants

Balusamy, Satheesh

Goldnest Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alvarez, Justin M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (OLD: Justin M. Alvarez; NEW: James B. Devine) filed by Gulecha, Nidhi on 01/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served John Doe Co-Occupant) filed by Gulecha, Nidhi on 10/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served John Doe Co-Occupant) filed by Gulecha, Nidhi on 10/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 09/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 09/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gulecha, Nidhi on 09/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gulecha, Nidhi on 09/16/2021. Filed By: Gulecha, Nidhi(Plaintiff) Refers To: Goldnest Inc(Defendant) | Balusamy, Satheesh(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ JUSTIN MICHAEL