Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:25 (UTC).

NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP vs. Francisco Calderon

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Francisco Calderon. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP

Defendants

Calderon, Francisco

Calderon, Miguel

Garcia, Patricia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evans, Chris J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2017
  • Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned (unsatisfied) filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 04/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Writ issued on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Application for Writ of Possession filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Judgment for NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP against Calderon, Francisco ;Calderon, Miguel ;Garcia, Patricia in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Default entered as to Garcia, Patricia on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Default entered as to Calderon, Miguel on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Default entered as to Calderon, Francisco on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Francisco Calderon-tenant) filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (clerk's judgment; unnamed occupants) filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Francisco Calderon=tenant) filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (served Francisco Calderon-tenant; prejudgment claim of right to possession) filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 48.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP on 06/27/2014. Filed By: NF Moorpark Multifamily Associates LP(Plaintiff) Refers To: Calderon, Francisco(Defendant) | Calderon, Miguel(Defendant) | Garcia, Patricia(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less