This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 23:14:37 (UTC).

Natalia Costabile vs. Mark Genis

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Natalia Costabile filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Mark Genis. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Costabile, Natalia

Costabile, Thomas

Defendants

Best Alliance Foreclosure and Lien Services

Mark Genis as an individual and as Trustee of the Mark Genis Trust Agreement as Amended and Restated on

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kwasigroch, Michael D.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 08/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing - For Reference Only (CCM); Description: w/19-00537805-CU (Genis vs. Costabile) and 20-00538927-CU (Costabile vs. Genis); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketHearing - For Reference Only (CCM) - w/19-00537805-CU (Genis vs. Costabile) and 20-00538927-CU (Costabile vs. Genis) scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketHearing - For Reference Only (CCM) - w/19-00537805-CU (Genis vs. Costabile) and 20-00538927-CU (Costabile vs. Genis) scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: stay foreclosure and for filing of lis pendens; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/22/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Withdrawal and Withdrawal of Exparte by Plaintiffs) filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 06/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - stay foreclosure and for filing of lis pendens scheduled for 06/22/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Thomas Costabile in Support of Exparte) filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 06/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Natalia Costabile in Support of Exparte) filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 06/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (RE Ex Parte Notice) filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 06/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Genis this Exparte Brought by Plaintiffs Natalia Costabile and Thomas Costabile to Restrain Defendants their Agents Assigns Representatives and All Persons Acting on Behalf) filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 06/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 06/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Costabile, Natalia; Costabile, Thomas on 06/17/2021. Filed By: Costabile, Natalia(Plaintiff) | Costabile, Thomas(Plaintiff) Refers To: Best Alliance Foreclosure and Lien Services(Defendant) | Mark Genis as an individual and as Trustee of the Mark Genis Trust Agreement Dated March 31 2011 as Amended and Restated on July 10 2013(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST ALLIANCE FORECLOSURE AND LIEN SERVICES CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwasigroch, Michael D.