Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 07:55:01 (UTC).

Nandakumar Shanmugam vs. Capital Group Companies Inc

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Nandakumar Shanmugam filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Capital Group Companies Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shanmugam, Nandakumar

Defendant

Capital Group Companies Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Crowther, Robyn C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service ((CCP 1011) served Request for Production of Docments Set Three; Request for Discovery Special Interrogatories Two; Served to Steptoe & Johnson LLP (Sonia B; Receptionist/Authorized to Accept)) filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 06/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Served Sonia Brand on behalf of Steptoe & Johnson LLP c/o Robyn Crowther; Plaintiff's Nandakumar Shanmugam Request Set Two for Production of Documents; Plaintiff's Nandakumar Shanmugam Special Interrogatories to Defendant Capital Group Companies Inc) filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 05/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (by Certified mail, Return Receipt requested) filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 04/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (by Certified Mail , Return Receipt Requested) filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 03/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (by Certified Mail; Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents) filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 03/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Capital Group Companies Inc on 02/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Agent of service: Angela M. Mitchell. Served Danielle Redmond, person in charge, office services) filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Shanmugam, Nandakumar on 01/04/2021. Filed By: Shanmugam, Nandakumar(Plaintiff) Refers To: Capital Group Companies Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital Group Companies Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROWTHER ROBYN