This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 21:37:51 (UTC).

Musclewerks v. Pharmatech

Case Summary

On 11/09/2016 Musclewerks filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Pharmatech. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Sharma, Shrey Aditya

PHarmatech Manufacturing Inc. a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Tedesco, Thomas J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Weller, Charles C.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Description: for Failure to Appear on 3/9 as to Plaintiff; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2016
  • Proof of Service (of Notice of Motion and Motion for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction, Memo of Ps & As in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Issuance of a Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of David Garcia in Support) filed by Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation on 12/12/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (John Doe, Person in Charge and also served Notice of Motion and Motion for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction) filed by Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation on 12/02/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Shrey Aditya Sharma, Agent for Service. Also served Notice of Motion and Motion for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction) filed by Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation on 12/02/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 11/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM) - by counsel for Plaintiff Muscleworks scheduled for 12/15/2016 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Motion - Other (and issuance of preliminary injunction, memorandum of points and authorities in support of plaintiffs request for issuance of a preliminary; declaration of David Garcia in support) filed by Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation on 11/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation on 11/09/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Complaint filed by Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation on 11/09/2016. Filed By: Musclewerks Inc. a California Corporation(Plaintiff) Refers To: PHarmatech Manufacturing Inc. a California Corporation(Defendant) | Sharma, Shrey(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less