This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 20:24:13 (UTC).

Mora vs. CarMax Auto Superstores

Case Summary

On 10/05/2016 Mora filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CarMax Auto Superstores. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mora, Ariana

Defendants

CarMax Business Services LLC

CarMax Auto Superstores West Coast Inc

Carmax Auto Superstores California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOBASSERI, ROBERT B

COOPER, DAVID ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

SCHLICHTER, KURT ANDREW

Wheeler, Kevin B.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:43 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Quash; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 10:43 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Quash; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • Motion to Strike - reserved for carmax scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Motion to Strike (Portions of Pltfs Complaint) filed by CarMax Auto Superstores West Coast Inc; CarMax Business Services LLC on 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Demurrer (CLM) - on behalf of deft scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Demurrer filed by CarMax Auto Superstores West Coast Inc; CarMax Business Services LLC on 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Becky DeGeorge) filed by Mora, Ariana on 11/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Becky DeGeorge) filed by Mora, Ariana on 11/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/03/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mora, Ariana on 10/05/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Complaint filed by Mora, Ariana on 10/05/2016. Filed By: Mora, Ariana(Plaintiff) Refers To: CarMax Auto Superstores West Coast Inc(Defendant) | CarMax Business Services LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less