This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 11:50:54 (UTC).

Moore vs Mojabi

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Moore filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mojabi. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Helgren, Poppy

Lester G Moore by and through his Successor in Interest Poppy Helgren

Defendants

Mojabi, Sally

Sallys Residential Care Home Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK, STEVEN C.

Defendant Attorney

Walker, Kathleen

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lester G Moore by and through his Successor in Interest Poppy Helgren; Helgren, Poppy on 12/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement (Filed No Later Than January 12, 2023) filed by Helgren, Poppy; Lester G Moore by and through his Successor in Interest Poppy Helgren on 10/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Mojabi, Sally on 09/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 07/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 09/13/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike - scheduled for 09/13/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike (Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Srbui Karapetyan) filed by Mojabi, Sally; Sallys Residential Care Home Inc on 07/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Srbui Karapetyan) filed by Mojabi, Sally; Sallys Residential Care Home Inc on 07/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Poppy Helgren as Successor-in-Interest to Lester G. Moore Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 377.32) filed by Helgren, Poppy on 07/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Stacy Eagle Administrator) filed by Helgren, Poppy; Lester G Moore by and through his Successor in Interest Poppy Helgren on 05/24/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lester G Moore by and through his Successor in Interest Poppy Helgren; Helgren, Poppy on 05/17/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lester G Moore by and through his Successor in Interest Poppy Helgren; Helgren, Poppy on 05/17/2022. Filed By: Lester G Moore by and through his Successor in Interest Poppy Helgren(Plaintiff) | Helgren, Poppy(Plaintiff) Refers To: Mojabi, Sally(Defendant) | Sallys Residential Care Home Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.