This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 07:01:09 (UTC).

Moistner vs. Aerojet

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Moistner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Aerojet. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Moistner, Beverly

Moistner, Todd

Defendants

Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc

The Boeing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Graham, Anthony G.

Defendant Attorneys

Tsoumas, Tammy A

Goldstein, Jonathan S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (Federal Case No 2.21.cv.03138) filed by Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc; The Boeing Company on 04/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Daisy Montenegro / CT Corp , person authorized) filed by Moistner, Beverly on 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Trudy Desbiens / CSC , person authorized) filed by Moistner, Beverly on 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Full) filed by Moistner, Todd on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Full) filed by Moistner, Beverly on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMoistner, Todd Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Moistner, Todd on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMoistner, Beverly Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Moistner, Beverly on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Moistner, Beverly; Moistner, Todd on 03/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Moistner, Beverly; Moistner, Todd on 03/08/2021. Filed By: Moistner, Beverly(Plaintiff) | Moistner, Todd(Plaintiff) Refers To: Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc(Defendant) | The Boeing Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TSOUMAS TAMMY ANN