This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/20/2022 at 02:48:48 (UTC).

Mobin Mahdi vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Mobin Mahdi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mahdi, Mobin

Mocar LLC

Defendants

General Motors LLC

Silver Star Motor Car Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, NORMAN F.

Defendant Attorney

Arens, Mary Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Silver Star Motor Car Company on 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by General Motors LLC on 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketArens, Mary Lynn added as a effective 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Unknown/Unidentified Agent of Service. Served John Doe, authorized to accept. Per CCP 415.20(a)) filed by Mahdi, Mobin on 08/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent of service: CSC Lawyers: Nicole Strauss) filed by Mahdi, Mobin; Mocar LLC on 08/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subserved to Karla Chesmart) filed by Mahdi, Mobin; Mocar LLC on 08/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mahdi, Mobin; Mocar LLC on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mahdi, Mobin; Mocar LLC on 08/02/2021. Filed By: Mahdi, Mobin(Plaintiff) | Mocar LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Silver Star Motor Car Company(Defendant) | General Motors LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR NORMAN F.