This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 07:02:36 (UTC).

Miguel Rodriguez vs. Carmen Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Miguel Rodriguez filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Carmen Rodriguez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Rodriguez, Miguel

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Rodriguez, Sergio

Valeriano, Guadalupe

Rodriguez, Carmen

All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property commonly described as 655 Dahl Ave Port Hueneme CA 93041 adverse to Plaintiffs title or any cloud upon Plaintiffs title thereto

Lantry, Christina

Lantry Rodriguez, Christina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Roble, Peter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross Complaint) filed by Rodriguez, Miguel on 08/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Errata to Their Cross-Complaint) filed by Rodriguez, Carmen; Rodriguez, Sergio; Lantry Rodriguez, Christina; Valeriano, Guadalupe on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Errata (to Cross-Complaint) filed by Rodriguez, Carmen; Rodriguez, Sergio; Lantry Rodriguez, Christina; Valeriano, Guadalupe on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Rodriguez, Carmen; Rodriguez, Sergio; Lantry Rodriguez, Christina; Valeriano, Guadalupe on 07/14/2021. Filed By: Valeriano, Guadalupe(Cross - Complainant) | Lantry Rodriguez, Christina(Cross - Complainant) | Rodriguez, Sergio(Cross - Complainant) | Rodriguez, Carmen(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Rodriguez, Miguel(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Rodriguez, Carmen; Rodriguez, Sergio; Lantry Rodriguez, Christina; Valeriano, Guadalupe on 07/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketLantry Rodriguez, Christina added as a Defendant effective 07/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Miguel on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rodriguez, Miguel on 05/20/2021. Filed By: Rodriguez, Miguel(Plaintiff) Refers To: Rodriguez, Carmen(Defendant) | Rodriguez, Sergio(Defendant) | Lantry, Christina(Defendant) | Valeriano, Guadalupe(Defendant) | All persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property commonly described as 655 Dahl Ave Port Hueneme CA 93041 adverse to Plaintiffs title or any cloud upon Plaintiffs title thereto(Defendant) | Lantry Rodriguez, Christina(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD