This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/10/2018 at 10:04:53 (UTC).

Miguel Longines vs. Crown Plaza Ventura Beach Hotel

Case Summary

On 01/05/2009 Miguel Longines filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Crown Plaza Ventura Beach Hotel. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Longines, Miguel

Defendants

PROVIDENCE HOSPITALITY PARTNERS, LLC

Crown Plaza Ventura Beach Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BASSEY, ED K.

Defendant Attorney

Hishmeh, Tareq M

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:20 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:20 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 7 Days Estimated time,; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • Past Events - Event Type: CMC: Further Case Management Statement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • Past Events - Event Type: Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • Past Events - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 3:20 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • Past Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2009
  • Demurrer (CLM) - to Complaint scheduled for 03/10/2009 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Amount of 350.00 received for 27 - Answer or other 1st paper >$25K on 02/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Amount of 350.00 received for 27 - Answer or other 1st paper >$25K on 02/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Demurrer (to Complaint) filed by Crown Plaza Ventura Beach Hotel on 02/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (By subserving Danny Quintana) filed by Longines, Miguel on 01/12/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Statement of Damages filed by Longines, Miguel on 01/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Longines, Miguel on 01/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Longines, Miguel on 01/05/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Complaint filed by Longines, Miguel on 01/05/2009. Filed By: Longines, Miguel(Plaintiff) Refers To: PROVIDENCE HOSPITALITY PARTNERS, LLC(Defendant) | Crown Plaza Ventura Beach Hotel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Providence Hospitality Partners LLC is a litigant