Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:16 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Susan Scheimann

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Susan Scheimann. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Scheimann, Susan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harris, Stelios A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Levy (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Levy (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Levy (CLM); Description: as to Susan Scheimann; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Order Re Claim of Exemption filed by Scheimann, Susan on 09/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Claim of Exemption - Levy (CLM) heard 09/19/2017 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Claim of exemption is granted in part.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Claim of Exemption - Levy (CLM) - as to Susan Scheimann scheduled for 09/19/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment - CCP585 (Affidavit) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (interest and evidence code 1550) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Default entered as to Scheimann, Susan on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Scheimann, Susan(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less