Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:13:47 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Milton Manankil

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Milton Manankil. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Manankil, Milton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lusis, Karen Etsell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 02/18/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Midland Funding LLC on 01/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 02/18/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Manankil, Milton(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less