Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:13 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Juan Trujillo

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Juan Trujillo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Trujillo, Juan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lusis, Karen Etsell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Judgment for Midland Funding LLC against Trujillo, Juan in the amount of: 1871.64 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 311.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Affidavit - Other (CCP585) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Default entered as to Trujillo, Juan on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC on 07/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Declaration Regarding Non Service (Summons and Complaint) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 07/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Trujillo, Juan(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less