This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 03:57:51 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. John Barone

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against John Barone. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Barone, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Casey, Chad K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Brianna Barone) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Midland Funding LLC on 05/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Barone, John(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAD K CASEY