This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 03:27:00 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Branden Grange

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Branden Grange. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Grange, Branden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sullivan, Patrick T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketCase File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Midland Funding LLC on 11/29/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Midland Funding LLC rejected on 05/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Grange, Branden(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK T SULLIVAN