This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/20/2022 at 17:17:36 (UTC).

Mid Century Ins vs. Herndon

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Mid Century Ins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Herndon. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mid Century Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Herndon, Tobe

Roger L Smith Inc

Cross Defendants

Stuebing, Karen

Stuebing, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Park, Kevin H

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Giannetto, Alex M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Roger L Smith Inc on 11/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Roger L Smith Inc rejected on 11/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions: (as to Waiver of Costs) filed by Mid Century Insurance Company on 11/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Roger L Smith Inc on 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Michael Stuebing Husband) filed by Roger L Smith Inc on 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketStuebing, Karen added as a Cross - Defendant effective 06/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketStuebing, Michael added as a Cross - Defendant effective 06/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 06/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Roger L Smith Inc on 06/15/2021. Filed By: Roger L Smith Inc(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Stuebing, Michael(Cross - Defendant) | Stuebing, Karen(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Roger L Smith Inc on 06/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Judy Doe Authorized to Accept Service of Process) filed by Mid Century Insurance Company on 04/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Roger L Smith Registered Agent for Service of Process) filed by Mid Century Insurance Company on 04/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mid Century Insurance Company on 04/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mid Century Insurance Company on 04/12/2021. Filed By: Mid Century Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Herndon, Tobe(Defendant) | Roger L Smith Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROGER L SMITH INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK KEVIN HUNTER