This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 04:51:10 (UTC).

Michelle Dubinski vs. Los Robles Regional Medical Center LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Michelle Dubinski filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Los Robles Regional Medical Center LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dubinski, Michelle

Defendants

Healthtrust Workforce Solutions LLC

Los Robles Regional Medical Center LLC

Parallon Enterprises LLC

Los Robles Regional Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grombacher, Kiley L

Defendant Attorneys

Habib, Hilary A.

Hamilton, Melanie M.

Kearnaghan, Jason W.

Simmons, Richard J.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:01 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (First) filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 04/21/2022. Filed By: Dubinski, Michelle(Plaintiff) Refers To: Parallon Enterprises LLC(Defendant) | Healthtrust Workforce Solutions LLC(Defendant) | Los Robles Regional Medical Center LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting (Stipulation for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint) filed by Los Robles Regional Medical Center; Dubinski, Michelle; Healthtrust Workforce Solutions LLC; Parallon Enterprises LLC on 04/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Other (for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint) filed by Los Robles Regional Medical Center; Dubinski, Michelle; Healthtrust Workforce Solutions LLC; Parallon Enterprises LLC on 04/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Complex Track heard 01/10/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 01/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 01/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Los Robles Regional Medical Center on 12/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent Diana Ruiz of CT Corporation system) filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 09/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent Diana Ruiz of CT Corporation system) filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 09/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent Diana Ruiz of CT Corporation system) filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 09/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Time: 3:01 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 08/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 08/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 08/26/2021 03:01:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 08/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dubinski, Michelle on 08/25/2021. Filed By: Dubinski, Michelle(Plaintiff) Refers To: Los Robles Regional Medical Center LLC(Defendant) | Parallon Enterprises LLC(Defendant) | Healthtrust Workforce Solutions LLC(Defendant) | Los Robles Regional Medical Center(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARRALLON ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER MOB, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Habib, Hilary A.