This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 14:29:31 (UTC).

Michael Sheets vs. Jennifer Blais

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Michael Sheets filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jennifer Blais. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheets, Michael

Defendant

Blais, Jennifer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michie, Douglas C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned (Satisfied) filed by Sheets, Michael on 09/06/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketWrit issued on 08/11/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession filed by Sheets, Michael on 08/11/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketJudgment for Sheets, Michael against Blais, Jennifer in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 08/03/2022. Possession Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (Possession Only) filed by Sheets, Michael on 08/03/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Clerk's Judgment filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Application and Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession) submitted by Sheets, Michael rejected on 07/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Blais, Jennifer on Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketVerification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Served Jennifer Blais, Resident; Per CCP 415.46) filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession) filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 45.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sheets, Michael on 07/13/2022. Filed By: Sheets, Michael(Plaintiff) Refers To: Blais, Jennifer(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michie, Douglas C.