This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 01:34:16 (UTC).

Michael Campbell vs. Milgard Manufacturing Inc

Case Summary

On 04/16/2015 Michael Campbell filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Milgard Manufacturing Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondent / Appellees

Campbell, Michael

McMillian, Shannell

Defendants and Appellants

Guynes, George

Milgard Manufacturing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Weilbacher, Brian R

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

FARBER, MIA

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:15 AM; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 10:15 AM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Filing of Request for Dismissal; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Description: and Why Stay Should Not Be Lifted; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Vacate Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Compel Dispute ...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Dispute Resolution Process of pltffs individual causes of action & dismissal of action as to pltffs ...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2015
  • Motion to Compel (Dispute Resolution Process of pltffs individual causes of action & dismissal of action as to pltffs individual causes of action or in the alternative for immediate stay of Judicial Proceedings as to pltffs individual causes of action memo of ps&as) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc; Guynes, George on 05/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Declaration - Other (of Mia Farber in support of defts Motion to Compel Dispute Resolution Process of Pltffs individual causes of action & dismissal of action as to pltffs individual causes of action or in the alternative for immediate stay of Judicial Proceedings et al) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc; Guynes, George on 05/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • FARBER, MIA added as a effective 06/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Campbell, Michael; McMillian, Shannell on 05/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Mia Farber signed on behalf of defendant) filed by Campbell, Michael on 05/05/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt filed by Campbell, Michael; McMillian, Shannell on 05/05/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/16/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Campbell, Michael; McMillian, Shannell on 04/16/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Complaint filed by Campbell, Michael; McMillian, Shannell on 04/16/2015. Filed By: Campbell, Michael(Plaintiff) | McMillian, Shannell(Plaintiff) Refers To: Milgard Manufacturing Inc(Defendant) | Guynes, George(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less