This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/13/2020 at 06:43:55 (UTC).

Mezo vs. FCA Us LLC

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 Mezo filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FCA Us LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin

Nadine Groten an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin

Defendants and Respondent / Appellees

Crown Dodge

ZF Friedrichshafen Ag

FCA Us LLC

Interested Party

Feinberg, Rachel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

CROCKETT, ROBERT D.

Defendant and Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Cosgrove, Philip R.

LATIOLAIT, ANTHONY F.

De Metruis, Christine C.

YOKA, WALTER M.

Whitefield, Derek S

Cosgrove, Ryan E.

Fresard, Fred J

Rodney, Alsion

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Quash; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Quash; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketJudgment amended. See AMENDED Judgment on Jury Verdict for Further Details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketAmended Judgment (on Jury Verdict) filed by FCA US LLC; Crown Dodge on 03/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketStipulation for Entry of Judgment (on Jury Verdict and Order) filed by FCA US LLC; Crown Dodge on 03/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: For an Award of Costs Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 2033.420, Including Attorney Fees ...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion - Other (CLM) heard 02/24/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal filed by Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin; Nadine Groten an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin on 02/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (Joint) filed by FCA US LLC; Crown Dodge on 01/31/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 11:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
963 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - to Plaintiffs Complaint scheduled for 09/11/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketDemurrer (to Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by FCA US LLC on 08/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (AMENDED; by serving Jennifer Churchhill, authorized to accept service, registered agent) filed by Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin on 07/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Nadine Groten an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin; Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin on 07/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served to Jennifer Churchill authorized to accept service at corporation registered agent) filed by Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin on 07/12/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served to) filed by Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin on 07/12/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin; Nadine Groten an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin on 07/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin; Nadine Groten an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin on 07/03/2017. Filed By: Nadine Groten an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin(Plaintiff) | Sandra Mezo an individual and successor in interest to Morton Lavin(Plaintiff) Refers To: Crown Dodge(Defendant) | ZF Friedrichshafen Ag(Defendant) | FCA US LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less