This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 00:07:22 (UTC).

McDonald vs. Adventist Health

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 McDonald filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Adventist Health. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McDonald, Michelle

Defendants

Adventist Health Simi Valley

Allied Emergency Physicians

Chu MD, Kyo

Gharakhani DO, Hossien

JJ&R Emergency Medical Group of California Inc

Kuban MD, Alan

Runnels PA C, Hillary

Trivedi MD, Mayur

Vickers PA C, Ryan Tait

Chu MD, Kyo Yong

Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bunch, Bruce M.

Defendant Attorneys

HOFFMAN, BRIAN L.

TROTTER, MICHAEL J.

MAYER, PATRICK W

Blackstone-Lowell, Rebecca J.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: compliance with subpoena duces tecum; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOrder - Other (to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum) filed by Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services on 05/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion to Compel heard 05/17/2022 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketReply (Brief to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum) filed by Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services on 05/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel - compliance with subpoena duces tecum scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 04/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum) filed by Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services on 04/11/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (STATEMENT of DAMAGES. Served Matt Donahoe, Nursing Supervisor) filed by McDonald, Michelle on 12/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by McDonald, Michelle on 12/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by McDonald, Michelle on 12/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Whole) filed by McDonald, Michelle on 11/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMcDonald, Michelle Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by McDonald, Michelle on 11/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McDonald, Michelle on 11/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by McDonald, Michelle on 11/18/2021. Filed By: McDonald, Michelle(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kuban MD, Alan(Defendant) | Vickers PA C, Ryan(Defendant) | Gharakhani DO, Hossien(Defendant) | Allied Emergency Physicians(Defendant) | JJ&R Emergency Medical Group of California Inc(Defendant) | Chu MD, Kyo(Defendant) | Trivedi MD, Mayur(Defendant) | Adventist Health Simi Valley(Defendant) | Runnels PA C, Hillary(Defendant) | Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services(Defendant) | Chu MD, Kyo(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Emergency Physicians Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where JJ&R EMERGENCY MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL is a litigant