This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 03:26:36 (UTC).

May vs. Amcord Inc

Case Summary

On 06/11/2015 May filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Amcord Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joseph David May as successor in Interest to Thomas May

Lynch, Barbara Vee

May, James Joseph

Defendants

Amcord Inc

American Builders Supply Inc

Calportland Co.

Canoga Builders Supply

Certainteed Corporation

Conwed Corporation

Elementis Chemicals Inc

Georgia Pacific Corporation

Hansen Permanente Cement Inc

Highland Stucco and Lime Hill Brothers Chemical Company

John K Bice Co. Inc

Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc

Kelly Moore Paint Company Inc

Mannington Mills

Parex USA Inc

Soco West Inc

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fishback, Stephen M.

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDBERG, A. SCOTT

Hagopian, David G

Khare, Viiu Spangler

Nichols, Stephen M.

McGahey, Erin S

Fitzpatrick, Jennifer D.

KANNETT, MARK S

Judin, Jennifer

Schirm, Barry R.

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Prindle, Kenneth B

Martinez, Reynold M.

Other Attorneys

Day, Taylor C

Spanos, Evanthia M.

Broccardo Van Dam, Tina

Fiola, N. Asir

Blomquist, Sonja E

Konigsberg, Renee

Buty, Madeline L.

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:08 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:34 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:27 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:08 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:34 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 2:27 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
424 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketThompson Building Materials Inc added as a Defendant effective 08/04/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hill Brothers Chemical Company on 07/20/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed by Georgia Pacific LLC on 07/15/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Jury Fee Deposit) filed by Joseph David May as successor in Interest to Thomas May; May, James Joseph; Lynch, Barbara Vee on 07/08/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketAnswer filed by Elementis Chemicals Inc on 07/01/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance VENTURA generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/09/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Joseph David May as successor in Interest to Thomas May; May, James Joseph; May, James Joseph; Lynch, Barbara Vee on 06/11/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed by Joseph David May as successor in Interest to Thomas May; May, James Joseph; May, James Joseph; Lynch, Barbara Vee on 06/11/2015. Filed By: May, Thomas Shawn(Plaintiff) | Joseph David May as successor in Interest to Thomas May(Plaintiff) | May, James Joseph(Plaintiff) | Lynch, Barbara Vee(Plaintiff) Refers To: Amcord Inc(Defendant) | American Builders Supply Inc(Defendant) | Calportland Co.(Defendant) | Canoga Builders Supply(Defendant) | Certainteed Corporation(Defendant) | Conwed Corporation(Defendant) | Elementis Chemicals Inc(Defendant) | Georgia Pacific Corporation(Defendant) | Glendale Builders Supplies(Defendant) | Hansen Permanente Cement Inc(Defendant) | Highland Stucco and Lime Hill Brothers Chemical Company(Defendant) | John K Bice Co. Inc(Defendant) | Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc(Defendant) | Kelly Moore Paint Company Inc(Defendant) | Mannington Mills(Defendant) | Parex USA Inc(Defendant) | Soco West Inc(Defendant) | Georgia Pacific LLC(Defendant) | Thompson Building Materials(Defendant) | Westside Building Material Corp(Defendant) | Hanson Permanente Cement Inc(Defendant) | UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION(Defendant) | Hill Brothers Chemical Company(Defendant) | Union Carbide(Defendant) | Supro Corp.(Defendant) | Highland Stucco and Lime Products Inc(Defendant) | Supro Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less