This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 11:00:22 (UTC).

Matthew Smith vs. Fire Insurance Exchange

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Matthew Smith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fire Insurance Exchange. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Matthew

Defendant

Fire Insurance Exchange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Furtado, David J

Defendant Attorney

Alvarez, Sander

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Smith, Matthew on 07/21/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order) filed by Smith, Matthew; Fire Insurance Exchange on 06/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketProof of service (AMENDED) (RE: summons & complaint. served Alexander Martinez, person authorized to accept) filed by Smith, Matthew on 04/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (received on 03/01/22) submitted by Smith, Matthew rejected on 03/07/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Smith, Matthew rejected on 03/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Smith, Matthew rejected on 02/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Smith, Matthew rejected on 02/17/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Received via One Legal on 02 16 2022) submitted by Smith, Matthew rejected on 02/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (to Alexander Martinez, authorized to accept) filed by Smith, Matthew on 02/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Fire Insurance Exchange on 02/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Smith, Matthew rejected on 01/06/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Smith, Matthew rejected on 12/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smith, Matthew on 11/10/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Smith, Matthew on 11/10/2021. Filed By: Smith, Matthew(Plaintiff) Refers To: Fire Insurance Exchange(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less