This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 04:17:33 (UTC).

Maryan Abbasi Baharanchi vs. Mark J Direnzo

Case Summary

On 09/18/2013 Maryan Abbasi Baharanchi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mark J Direnzo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Baharanchi, Maryan Abbasi

Baharanchi, Maryam Abbasi

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Direnzo, Mark J

Direnzo, Teresa

Scribner, Patricia Thomas

Thomas Scribner, Patricia

Direnzo, Mark

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Direnzo, Teresa

Thomas Scribner, Patricia

Direnzo, Mark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neal Lopez, Tracy

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PUCKETT, KIM B

Kalpakian, Stephen

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Amend (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Quash; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (MSC); Event Time: 11:25 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Amend (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
263 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Direnzo, Mark; Direnzo, Teresa on 10/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • Answer filed by Direnzo, Mark; Direnzo, Teresa on 10/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Direnzo, Mark added as a Defendant effective 10/29/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Sub-served Neil Thomas Scribner) filed by Baharanchi, Maryan Abbasi on 10/18/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Sub-served Mark J Direnzo co-occupant) filed by Baharanchi, Maryan Abbasi on 10/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Baharanchi, Maryan Abbasi on 10/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/19/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baharanchi, Maryan Abbasi on 09/18/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • Complaint filed by Baharanchi, Maryan Abbasi on 09/18/2013. Filed By: Baharanchi, Maryam Abbasi(Plaintiff) Refers To: Direnzo, Mark(Defendant) | Direnzo, Mark(Defendant) | Direnzo, Teresa(Defendant) | Thomas Scribner, Patricia(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less