This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 07:24:34 (UTC).

Martha Vincent vs. Dawn Christie

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Martha Vincent filed an Other lawsuit against Dawn Christie. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent, Martha

Defendants

Pequignot, Johnny

Christie, Dawn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, BARRY E

Defendant Attorney

Santos, Patrick T

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: to Change Venue; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion - Other (CLM) heard 04/30/2021 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketObjection (to filed but Unserved Opposition to Motion to Chang Venue, Request to Continue Hearing due to Actual Prejudice, Declaration of Patrick Santos) filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny on 04/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Change Venue) filed by Vincent, Martha on 04/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendants Motion to Change Venue, Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Barry E Cohen in Support thereof) filed by Vincent, Martha on 04/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (CLM) - to Change Venue scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (to Change Venue; Memorandum in Support of Motion for Change of Venue; Declarations of Defendants) filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny on 04/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPequignot, Johnny Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Pequignot, Johnny on 02/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Whole) filed by Christie, Dawn on 02/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketChristie, Dawn Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Christie, Dawn on 02/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Case #56-2010-00386347-CU-BC-VTA) filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny on 02/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP (Against Judge Walsh) filed by Christie, Dawn; Pequignot, Johnny on 02/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vincent, Martha on 11/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Vincent, Martha on 11/30/2020. Filed By: Vincent, Martha(Plaintiff) Refers To: Christie, Dawn(Defendant) | Pequignot, Johnny(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANTOS PATRICK THOMAS