This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 14:20:07 (UTC).

Marina Ayzenstein vs. Beachport Cottages Homeowners Association

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 Marina Ayzenstein filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Beachport Cottages Homeowners Association. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayzenstein, Marina

Defendant

Beachport Cottages Homeowners Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jones, F. Stephen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/31/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ayzenstein, Marina on 07/11/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Ayzenstein, Marina rejected on 07/03/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Sabrina Hurtado Secretary Person in Charge of Office) filed by Ayzenstein, Marina on 04/30/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/31/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ayzenstein, Marina on 04/05/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Complaint filed by Ayzenstein, Marina on 04/05/2018. Filed By: Ayzenstein, Marina(Plaintiff) Refers To: Beachport Cottages Homeowners Association(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beachport Cottages Homeowners Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL T. CHULAK & ASSOC., A LAW CORP. - F. STEPHEN JONES ESQ