This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 17:21:34 (UTC).

Maricela Orozco vs. Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Maricela Orozco filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orozco, Maricela

Defendants

Providence Hospitality Partners LLC

Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melmed, Jonathan

Defendant Attorneys

Hamilton, Melanie M.

Kearnaghan, Jason W.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:59 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:59 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 11:05 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 11:05 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 01/12/2022 11:05:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC; Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC on 01/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Orozco, Maricela on 12/08/2021. Filed By: Orozco, Maricela(Plaintiff) Refers To: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC(Defendant) | Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Other (for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) filed by Orozco, Maricela on 12/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (at Case Management Conference on December 3, 2021) filed by Orozco, Maricela on 12/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 08/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 3:59 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 3:59 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder After Hearing generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 08/25/2021 03:59:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Orozco, Maricela on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Orozco, Maricela on 08/23/2021. Filed By: Orozco, Maricela(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC(Defendant) | Providence Hospitality Partners LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Providence Hospitality Partners LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMILTON MELANIE MAUREEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEARNAGHAN JASON