This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/20/2018 at 18:04:28 (UTC).

Margot Sanchez vs. Oxnard Manor GP LLC

Case Summary

On 06/12/2015 Margot Sanchez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Oxnard Manor GP LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cruz, Margarito

Espinoza, Teresa

Faust, Lakedra

Sanchez, Margot

Defendants

Gatongay, Robert

Norman Management Corporation

Oxnard Manor GP LLC

Oxnard Manor LP

Rieder, Steven

Rockport Healthcare Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Templeman, Alan R

Defendant Attorneys

GILL, MONTY S.

Zilberman, Leonid M

Gunning, Daniel C

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 10 day jury trial; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Sanchez, Margot; Espinoza, Teresa on 05/05/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sanchez, Margot; Espinoza, Teresa; Faust, Lakedra; Cruz, Margarito on 07/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Jordan Balero agnt auth to accept) filed by Sanchez, Margot; Espinoza, Teresa; Faust, Lakedra; Cruz, Margarito on 07/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Devora percia person in charge in behalf of Steven Stroll agent) filed by Sanchez, Margot; Espinoza, Teresa; Faust, Lakedra; Cruz, Margarito on 07/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/09/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Margot; Espinoza, Teresa; Faust, Lakedra; Cruz, Margarito on 06/12/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Complaint filed by Sanchez, Margot; Espinoza, Teresa; Faust, Lakedra; Cruz, Margarito on 06/12/2015. Filed By: Sanchez, Margot(Plaintiff) | Espinoza, Teresa(Plaintiff) | Faust, Lakedra(Plaintiff) | Cruz, Margarito(Plaintiff) Refers To: Oxnard Manor LP(Defendant) | Oxnard Manor GP LLC(Defendant) | Norman Management Corporation(Defendant) | Rockport Healthcare Services(Defendant) | Rieder, Steven(Defendant) | Gatongay, Robert(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less