This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 11:20:37 (UTC).

Margarita Ortega vs. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Margarita Ortega filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ortega, Margarita

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOGHTADER, MICHAEL H

Defendant Attorney

HALM, DAVID G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ortega, Margarita on 04/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketOrder Remanding Case to Originating Court (2:21-cv-09303-PA-MAA) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 12/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer (& Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Target Corporation on 11/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketHALM, DAVID G added as a effective 11/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon Melvin Batista, authorized agent to accept service) filed by Ortega, Margarita on 11/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ortega, Margarita on 10/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ortega, Margarita on 10/04/2021. Filed By: Ortega, Margarita(Plaintiff) Refers To: Target Corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALM DAVID