This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 10:21:51 (UTC).

Marciano Pompa vs Balcom Canyon Pet Lodge

Case Summary

On 03/04/2014 Marciano Pompa filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Balcom Canyon Pet Lodge. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pompa, Mariciano

Pompa, Marciano

Defendant

Balcom Canyon Pet Lodge LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHISVIN, CRAIG L

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 1:36 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (SHC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (SHC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:17 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 1:36 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (SHC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (SHC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 10:17 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2014
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 08/01/2014 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/08/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Melissa Houlihan registered agent accepted service through Celine Gonzalez) filed by Pompa, Mariciano on 07/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Summons issued on 03/04/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/01/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pompa, Mariciano on 03/04/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Complaint filed by Pompa, Mariciano on 03/04/2014. Filed By: Pompa, Marciano(Plaintiff) Refers To: Balcom Canyon Pet Lodge LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less