This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 11:52:46 (UTC).

Lutz v Subaru of America

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Lutz filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Subaru of America. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lutz, Colleen

Defendant

Subaru of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOROWITZ, DEBORAH L

Le Pere, Jeffrey L.

Defendant Attorney

Ruggerello, Kristan L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Subaru of America Inc on 06/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint) submitted by Subaru of America Inc rejected on 06/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (Second) filed by Lutz, Colleen on 04/28/2021. Filed By: Lutz, Colleen(Plaintiff) Refers To: Subaru of America Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Permitting Filing of Second Amended Complaint) filed by Subaru of America Inc; Lutz, Colleen on 04/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (Second) submitted by Lutz, Colleen rejected on 04/05/2021. Filed By: Lutz, Colleen(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by Lutz, Colleen on 03/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - PERSONAL (Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions, Request for Production of Documents; served on CT Corp-Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist) filed by Lutz, Colleen on 03/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Additional 30 Days to File Responsive Pleading CCP 430.41 filed by Subaru of America Inc on 02/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon CT Corp - Albert Demonte, Person Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Lutz, Colleen on 01/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (First) filed by Lutz, Colleen on 01/21/2021. Filed By: Lutz, Colleen(Plaintiff) Refers To: Subaru of America Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served to CT- Corp, Albert Demonte- person authorized to accept service of process) filed by Lutz, Colleen on 01/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (of venue Pursuant to California civil Code 1780(c)) filed by Lutz, Colleen on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lutz, Colleen on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lutz, Colleen on 01/04/2021. Filed By: Lutz, Colleen(Plaintiff) Refers To: Subaru of America Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO KRISTAN LOUISE