Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 06:49:59 (UTC).

Julie Wetzel vs. Kaiser Permanente

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Julie Wetzel filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Kaiser Permanente. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wetzel, Lulie

Defendants

Moore MD, Kevin

Kaiser Permanente

Sanderson MD, Brent

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Community Memorial Hospital

Sanderson DO, Brent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TATOR, MALCOLM R.

Defendant Attorneys

Handlin, Rebecca T

Clinkenbeard, William

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement submitted by Wetzel, Julie rejected on 06/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Defendant Community Memorial Hospital) filed by Wetzel, Julie on 06/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Kaiser Permanente on 05/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Southern California Permanente Medical Group) filed by Wetzel, Julie on 05/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAmended (Demand that Defense of Statute of Limitations be Tried Separately) filed by Southern California Permanente Medical Group on 03/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Southern California Permanente Medical Group on 03/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDemand (That Defense of Statute of Limitations Be Tried Separately) filed by Southern California Permanente Medical Group on 03/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSouthern California Permanente Medical Group added as a Defendant effective 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Date of service: 11/12/2020. cost 75.00) filed by Wetzel, Lulie on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC Lawyers Registered Agenty by leaving with Lai Saevang, Person Authorized to Accept; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Wetzel, Lulie on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc added as a Defendant effective 11/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1 as Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc) filed by Wetzel, Lulie on 11/12/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC Lawyers Registered Agent by Leaving With Susie Vang, Person Authorized to Accept) filed by Wetzel, Lulie on 10/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wetzel, Lulie on 10/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wetzel, Lulie on 10/13/2020. Filed By: Wetzel, Lulie(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kaiser Permanente(Defendant) | Sanderson MD, Brent(Defendant) | Moore MD, Kevin(Defendant) | Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant) | Community Memorial Hospital(Defendant) | Southern California Permanente Medical Group(Defendant) | Sanderson DO, Brent(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant