This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/07/2020 at 01:49:53 (UTC).

Lugo vs The Vapor Dept LLC

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 Lugo filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against The Vapor Dept LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lugo, Christopher

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Vapor Dept LLC

Hernandez, Javier

iDrip Vape

IDrip Vape a Limited liability company

Vapor Dept LLC The a limited liability company

Rihani, Eyad

Vapor Dept LLC The A Limited Liabiity Company

Cross Defendants

LG Chem America Inc

Go Green Trading Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sua, Brandon

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Kinsberg, Shaina L.

REAGAN, BARRY J.

Cross Defendant Attorney

INGOLD, TREVOR J

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 7 day Jury Trial; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 09/22/2017 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - 7 day Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by IDrip Vape a Limited Liability Company; Rihani, Eyad on 07/10/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Lugo, Christopher on 07/10/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Defendants Vapor Dept LLC The and Javier Hernandez only from Complaint (Third)) filed by Lugo, Christopher on 06/20/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketDemurrer (to Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by IDrip Vape LLC; Rihani, Eyad on 08/19/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketIDrip Vape LLC added as a Defendant effective 08/19/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lugo, Christopher on 08/11/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Javier Hernandez person auth to accept service) filed by Lugo, Christopher on 08/09/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by sering Antonio Gomez Clerk, person in charge) filed by Lugo, Christopher on 08/09/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Eyad Rihani person auth to accept service) filed by Lugo, Christopher on 08/09/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/26/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lugo, Christopher on 05/31/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lugo, Christopher on 05/31/2016. Filed By: Lugo, Christopher(Plaintiff) Refers To: Vapor Dept LLC The a limited liability company(Defendant) | Hernandez, Javier(Defendant) | iDrip Vape(Defendant) | Rihani, Eyad(Defendant) | IDrip Vape a Limited Liability Company(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where iDrip Vape, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GO GREEN TRADING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG Chem America, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer INGOLD TREVOR J.