This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 08/20/2023 at 13:13:29 (UTC).

Louis Anthony Medina vs. Tina Olmeda

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Louis Anthony Medina filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Tina Olmeda. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CLMC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Medina, Louis Anthony

Defendants

Olmeda, Tina

Sheco Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez, Gregory J.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Updated -- Order Granting Ex Parte regarding Cremation:; Status Date changed from 04/04/2023 to 04/13/2023; Name Extension changed from [Proposed] to Granting Ex Parte regarding Cremation; Status changed from Received to Filed

04/13/2023: Updated -- Order Granting Ex Parte regarding Cremation:; Status Date changed from 04/04/2023 to 04/13/2023; Name Extension changed from [Proposed] to Granting Ex Parte regarding Cremation; Status changed from Received to Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show CauseRe Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to FileProof of Service/Default; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Ex Parte regarding Cremation:; Status Date changed from 04/04/2023 to 04/13/2023; Name Extension changed from [Proposed] to Granting Ex Parte regarding Cremation; Status changed from Received to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketOrder - Other submitted by Medina, Louis Anthony rejected on 03/09/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingName: Court Trial (SHC) Evidentiary Hearing; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 41 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 02/27/2023, Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingName: Ex Parte for Order Regarding Cremation; 02/24/2023 Department 41 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 41 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 02/27/2023, Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/27/2023 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketWitness List (of Petitioner Louis Medina) filed by Medina, Louis Anthony on 02/27/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingName: Ex Parte for Order Regarding Cremation; Status: Rescheduled; Department: Dept 41 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 02/24/2023, Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 02/27/2023 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/24/2023 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEx Parte - for Order Regarding Cremation scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Medina, Louis Anthony on 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEx Parte - for Order Regarding Cremation scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Medina, Louis Anthony on 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Louis Medina in Support of Ex Parte Application for Court Order) filed by Medina, Louis Anthony on 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (for Order Regarding Cremation) filed by Medina, Louis Anthony on 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/22/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Medina, Louis Anthony on 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by Medina, Louis Anthony on 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less