This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/26/2018 at 10:50:26 (UTC).

LORI L DELAO VS LANCE SHAWN CURTIS

Case Summary

On 09/19/2000 LORI L DELAO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LANCE SHAWN CURTIS. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8708

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2000

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELAO, LORI L

Defendants

CURTIS, LANCE SHAWN

DELTA LOGISTICS, INC

Interested Party

WORLEY, DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD, JOHN H

Defendant Attorneys

CABODI, K. J.

CREDE, KENNETH J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2013
  • Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • 08/27/2001: RESERVATION FOR JURY TRIAL AFTER ARBITRATION: TIME ESTIMATE 6 DAYS Hearing: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2001
  • 05/14/2001: This case # CIV198708 was ordered consolidated into case # CIV197429 on 05/04/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2001
  • 05/10/2001: Reason: Consolidation of cases..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2001
  • 05/10/2001: Minute Order: Vacating Appointment of Settlement Attorney DONALD R. WORLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • 04/19/2001: Declaration OF K.J. CABODI RE: UNAVAILABILITY FOR TRIAL FROM AUGUST 15, 2001 TO SEPTEMBER filed by LANCE SHAWN CURTIS, DELTA LOGISTICS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2001
  • 04/16/2001: Notice of Rejection of Arbitrator ARTHUR R. LIBERTY filed by LORI L DELAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • 04/04/2001: (S) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE NOTICE TO PROCEED: FILING REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2001
  • 01/12/2001: Substitution of Attorney filed. Former attorney FREDERICK H. BYSSHE JR. removed as to LORI L DELAO and replaced with attorney JOHN H HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2001
  • 01/11/2001: (S) Answer to COMPLAINT of DELAO filed by DELTA LOGISTICS, INC, represented by KENNETH J. CREDE Receipt Number: 101110337 for $193.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2001
  • 01/03/2001: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON COMPLAINT of DELAO AS TO LANCE CURTIS AND DELTA LOGISTICS, INC. Hearing: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • 09/19/2000: Summons Issued; 30 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • 09/19/2000: Case assigned to Courtroom 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • 09/19/2000: Summons Issued; 30 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • 09/19/2000: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • 09/19/2000: Case Information Sheet filed: Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time of trial: 5 DAYS. Mediation eligible: NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • 09/19/2000: Track assignment: Standard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • 09/19/2000: (S) Complaint filed Receipt Number: 9190366 for $193.0 Filed By: DELAO, LORI L(Plaintiff) Refers To: DELTA LOGISTICS, INC(Defendant) | CURTIS, LANCE(Defendant) | WORLEY, DONALD(Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWARD JOHN H.