This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 04:01:23 (UTC).

Lopez vs Kohandarvish

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 Lopez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kohandarvish. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Lopez, Laura

Cazares Garcia, Elsa

Gallardo, Nancy

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GILL, MONTY S.

Martinez, David

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MOGHADDAMI, ALI R

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 8:27 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 8:27 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc on 08/06/2015. Filed By: Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Lopez, Laura(Cross - Defendant) | Gallardo, Nancy(Cross - Defendant) | Cazares Garcia, Elsa(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Cazares Garcia, Elsa added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Gallardo, Nancy added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Answer filed by Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc on 08/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Negar Kohandarvish register agent) filed by Lopez, Laura on 07/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Summons issued on 06/24/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/25/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Laura on 06/24/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Complaint filed by Lopez, Laura on 06/24/2015. Filed By: Lopez, Laura(Plaintiff) Refers To: Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less