Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 05:10:30 (UTC).

Lisheski vs. Neurological Fitness

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Lisheski filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Neurological Fitness. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lisheski, Juliana

Lisheski, Marc

Defendant

Neurological Fitness Equipment and Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grombacher, Kiley L

BRADLEY, MARCUS J

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:36 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 02/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 02/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 3:36 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 02/22/2021 03:36:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lisheski, Juliana; Lisheski, Marc on 02/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lisheski, Juliana; Lisheski, Marc on 02/16/2021. Filed By: Lisheski, Marc(Plaintiff) | Lisheski, Juliana(Plaintiff) Refers To: Neurological Fitness Equipment and Education(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROMBACHER KILEY LYNN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY MARCUS J.