This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 08:00:25 (UTC).

Lindsay Brunk vs. Jesus Valdez

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 Lindsay Brunk filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Jesus Valdez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brunk, Lindsay

Defendants

Jesus Valdez Insurance Agency

Ramirez, Elsa

Valdez, Jesus

J Valdez Insurance Agency Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TASHNIZI, PAUL P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer filed by J Valdez Insurance Agency Inc on 03/13/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketJ Valdez Insurance Agency Inc added as a Defendant effective 03/13/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Jesus Valdez,Owner/Spouse) filed by Brunk, Lindsay on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Jesus Valdez, Agent/Owner) filed by Brunk, Lindsay on 02/21/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Statement of Venue - Personal submitted by Brunk, Lindsay rejected on 02/18/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brunk, Lindsay on 02/10/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brunk, Lindsay on 01/24/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by Brunk, Lindsay on 01/24/2023. Filed By: Brunk, Lindsay(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ramirez, Elsa(Defendant) | Jesus Valdez Insurance Agency(Defendant) | Valdez, Jesus(Defendant) | J Valdez Insurance Agency Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
990 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less