This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 02:13:33 (UTC).

Leonard Berman vs. J Craig Morgan

Case Summary

On 05/14/2010 Leonard Berman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against J Craig Morgan. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berman, Leonard

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Green Thumb International, Inc.

Morgan, Debbie

Morgan, J Craig

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, BRADFORD D.

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CRISLER, TED R.

Schenkman, Mark A.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 5 Day Time Estimate,; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 5 Day Time Estimate,; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 5 Day Time Estimate,; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Description: mandatory appearance as to plaintiffs attorney and Ted Crisler; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketCMC: Service of Cross Complaint - file proof of service on cross complaint of Green Thumb International Inc as to cross defendants Debbie Morgan and J Craig Morgan scheduled for 08/11/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Green Thumb International, Inc. on 07/02/2010. Filed By: Green Thumb International, Inc.(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Morgan, J(Cross - Defendant) | Morgan, Debbie(Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DocketAnswer filed by Green Thumb International, Inc. on 07/02/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (HD Berquist Jr. agent for service of process by serving Leslie Gann) filed by Berman, Leonard on 06/17/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by subserving Craig Morgan white male) filed by Berman, Leonard on 06/14/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Berman, Leonard on 05/14/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketDeclaration for Court Assignment filed by Berman, Leonard on 05/14/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Berman, Leonard on 05/14/2010. Filed By: Berman, Leonard(Plaintiff) Refers To: Morgan, J(Defendant) | Morgan, Debbie(Defendant) | Green Thumb International, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRISLER TED RUSSELL