This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 22:02:24 (UTC).

Leisure Village vs Estate of Josephine Cuffari Markey

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 Leisure Village filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Estate of Josephine Cuffari Markey. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leisure Village Association Inc

Defendant

Estate of Josephine Cuffari Markey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neal, Tracy R.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: /OSC Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/16/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by Leisure Village Association Inc on 06/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Non Service (Report) filed by Leisure Village Association Inc on 05/12/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 04/21/2017 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by Leisure Village Association Inc on 04/17/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/21/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Leisure Village Association Inc on 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Complaint filed by Leisure Village Association Inc on 11/21/2016. Filed By: Leisure Village Association Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Estate of Josephine Cuffari Markey(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less