Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 09:43:44 (UTC).

Lehr vs. Fiedler

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Lehr filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fiedler. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lehr, Jennifer

Lehr, David

Defendants

Pickford Real Estate Inc

Janet B Riordan Trustee of the GST Exempt Trust fbo Janet B Riordan UTD

Everest Realty Group California LTD

Joan A Fiedler individually and as Trustee of the GST Exempt Trust fbo Joan A Fiedler UTD

Rueckert, Christy

Tapia, Daniel Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francis, James Kelly

Defendant Attorney

ERLICH, RINAT B. KLIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Lehr, David; Lehr, Jennifer on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Tapia, Daniel Thomas; Pickford Real Estate Inc on 04/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Everest Realty Group California LTD; Rueckert, Christy on 03/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lehr, David; Lehr, Jennifer on 12/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lehr, David; Lehr, Jennifer on 12/17/2020. Filed By: Lehr, David(Plaintiff) | Lehr, Jennifer(Plaintiff) Refers To: Pickford Real Estate Inc(Defendant) | Everest Realty Group California LTD(Defendant) | Joan A Fiedler individually and as Trustee of the GST Exempt Trust fbo Joan A Fiedler UTD March 3, 2010(Defendant) | Rueckert, Christy(Defendant) | Janet B Riordan Trustee of the GST Exempt Trust fbo Janet B Riordan UTD March 3, 2010(Defendant) | Tapia, Daniel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Everest Realty Group California LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIER-ERLICH RINAT