This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 08:11:59

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 a Property - Eminent Domain case was filed by Las Posas Valley Water against Fox Cyn Groundwater in the jurisdiction of Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-VTA
  • Filing Date 03/27/2018
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Eminent Domain
  • Jurisdiction Ventura County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Ventura Hall Of Justice
  • County Ventura
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Saticoy Properties Llc
  • Represented By
    • Goldenring, Peter A.
    • Aladjem, David R.e.
  • Defendant Fox Canyon Groundwater Management Agency
  • Represented By
    • Gschwind, Andrew
    • Fudacz, Frederic
    • Nicholls, Gina
  • Defendant All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Compliant Adverse To Plaintiffs Title Or Any Cloud On Plaintiffs Title Thereto
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Rolling Green Hills Ranch Llc
  • Represented By
    • Goldenring, Peter A.
  • Plaintiff Las Posas Valley Water Rights Coalition
  • Represented By
    • Goldenring, Peter A.
  • Plaintiff Grimes Rock Inc
  • Represented By
    • Goldenring, Peter A.
    • Aladjem, David R.e.
  • Plaintiff Scs Partners
  • Represented By
    • Goldenring, Peter A.
  • Plaintiff Green Hills Ranch Llc
  • Represented By
    • Goldenring, Peter A.
    • Aladjem, David R.e.
  • Plaintiff Placco Inc
  • Represented By
    • Goldenring, Peter A.
    • Aladjem, David R.e.
  • Defendant Thermic Mutual Water Co Ltd
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Tim...

Free with Subscription
Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 36; Document: Minutes
  • 07/10/2018
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes
  • 08/22/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B
  • 07/23/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 36
  • 07/18/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Description: to Verified Complaint for Comprehensive Groundwater Adjudication; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20
  • 07/10/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Description: re Hearing to Determine if Action is Comprehensive Groundwater Adjudication Requiring Disqualificati...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20
  • 08/20/2018
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/22/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
  • 07/23/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (Regarding Comprehensive Adjudication Determination Requiring Disqualification of Ventura County Superior Court) filed by Placco Inc; Saticoy Properties LLC; Grimes Rock Inc; Green Hills Ranch LLC; Placco Inc; Las Posas Basin Water Rights Coalition; 49 Acre Scholle Ranch; William G Scholle Ranch; Rolling Green Hills Ranch LLC on 07/23/2018.
  • 07/23/2018
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 07/23/2018 08:30:00 AM.
  • 07/10/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Court's Motion (CLM) heard 07/10/2018 08:30:00 AM.
  • 07/09/2018
  • Supplemental (Brief RE Whether Action is a Comprehensive GroundWater Adjudication Requiring Disqaulification of Ventura Superior Court) filed by Fox Canyon Groundwater Management Agency on 07/09/2018.
  • 07/06/2018
  • Miscellaneous (Advisement to Court of Violation of Statute by FCGMA; Intent to FIle Motion to Recuse) filed by Placco Inc; Saticoy Properties LLC; Grimes Rock Inc; Green Hills Ranch LLC; Placco Inc; Las Posas Basin Water Rights Coalition; 49 Acre Scholle Ranch; William G Scholle Ranch on 07/06/2018.
  • 07/06/2018
  • Demurrer (CLM) - to Verified Complaint for Comprehensive Groundwater Adjudication scheduled for 07/18/2018 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 was vacated.
  • 07/05/2018
  • Complaint - Amended (FIRST amended verified complaint for Comprehensive Groundwater Adjudication; Injunctive and Declartory Relief; Quiet Title; Inverse Condemnation; and Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by Placco Inc; Saticoy Properties LLC; Grimes Rock Inc; Green Hills Ranch LLC; Placco Inc; Las Posas Basin Water Rights Coalition; 49 Acre Scholle Ranch; William G Scholle Ranch on 07/05/2018. Filed By: Saticoy Properties LLC(Plaintiff) | Grimes Rock Inc(Plaintiff) | Green Hills Ranch LLC(Plaintiff) | Placco Inc(Plaintiff) | Las Posas Basin Water Rights Coalition(Plaintiff) | 49 Acre Scholle Ranch(Plaintiff) | William G Scholle Ranch(Plaintiff) | Rolling Green Hills Ranch LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: all persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the property described in the compliant adverse to plaintiffs title or any cloud on plaintiffs title thereto(Defendant) | Fox Canyon Groundwater Management Agency(Defendant)
  • 07/06/2018
  • William G Scholle Ranch added as a Plaintiff effective 07/06/2018.
  • 07/06/2018
  • 49 Acre Scholle Ranch added as a Plaintiff effective 07/06/2018.
  • 07/06/2018
  • Las Posas Basin Water Rights Coalition added as a Plaintiff effective 07/06/2018.
  • 07/02/2018
  • Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Comprehensive Adjudication Determination Requiring Disqualification of Ventura County Superior Court) filed by Green Hills Ranch LLC; Grimes Rock Inc; Las Posas Valley Water Rights Coalition; Placco Inc; Rolling Green Hills Ranch LLC; SCS Partners; Saticoy Properties LLC on 07/02/2018.
  • 07/02/2018
  • Miscellaneous (Brief Regarding Compreshensive Adjudication Determination Requiring Disqualification of Ventura County Superior Court) filed by Green Hills Ranch LLC; Grimes Rock Inc; Las Posas Valley Water Rights Coalition; Placco Inc; Rolling Green Hills Ranch LLC; SCS Partners; Saticoy Properties LLC on 07/02/2018.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.