Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:13:50 (UTC).

Las Casitas Homeowners Association vs. Ramon Ramirez

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Las Casitas Homeowners Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ramon Ramirez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Las Casitas Homeowners Association

Defendant

Ramirez, Ramon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunter, Scott A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Costs (CCP 685.090) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 12/22/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs $1442.00, Credit $11587.54, Interest $102.28) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 11/30/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Costs (CCP 685.090) (Costs 672.00 adding to writ issued 12.29.14) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 05/27/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 672.00; Int 102.28) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 01/12/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Writ issued on 12/29/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Abstract issued on 12/29/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 12/29/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Judgment for Las Casitas Homeowners Association against Ramirez, Ramon in the amount of: 13693.25 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 344.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 895.00 attorney fees entered on 12/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 12/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Application - Other (for Court Judgment. Memo of Pts Auths. Declarations in support of Judgment) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 10/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 10/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Default entered as to Ramirez, Ramon on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 10/28/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 08/26/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Las Casitas Homeowners Association(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ramirez, Ramon(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less