Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:13:49 (UTC).

Las Casitas Homeowners Association vs. Carlos Garcia

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Las Casitas Homeowners Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Carlos Garcia. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Las Casitas Homeowners Association

Defendants

Garcia, Carlos

Peralta, Digna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunter, Scott A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion For Entry Of Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Motion For Entry Of Judgment - scheduled for 12/21/2015 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Declaration - Other (of Scott A Hunter Request to Vacate hearing on Motion for Entry of Judgment) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 12/10/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Motion For Entry Of Judgment - scheduled for 12/21/2015 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 11/17/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Motion - Other (for entry of judgment and attorney fees and costs memorandum of points and authorities declaration of Candice Hamilton declaration of Scott A Hunter and proposed judgment) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 11/17/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement (and Voluntary Dismissal) filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 12/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Default entered as to Peralta, Digna on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Default entered as to Garcia, Carlos on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 10/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 08/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 07/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Las Casitas Homeowners Association on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Las Casitas Homeowners Association(Plaintiff) Refers To: Garcia, Carlos(Defendant) | Peralta, Digna(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less