This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/19/2020 at 09:42:37 (UTC).

Kurt Dulka vs. Stephen Mairs

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Kurt Dulka filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stephen Mairs. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dulka, Kurt

Devine Dulka, Catherine

Defendants

Mairs, Araceli

Mairs, Stephen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LE, LAMDIEN T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment (Judgment and Supporting Declarations) submitted by Dulka, Kurt; Devine Dulka, Catherine rejected on 03/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Mairs, Araceli on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Mairs, Stephen on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Devine Dulka, Catherine; Dulka, Kurt on 01/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Dulka, Kurt; Devine Dulka, Catherine on 12/02/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Stephen Mairs Co Tenant) filed by Dulka, Kurt; Devine Dulka, Catherine on 12/02/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dulka, Kurt; Devine Dulka, Catherine on 11/15/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dulka, Kurt; Devine Dulka, Catherine on 11/15/2019. Filed By: Devine Dulka, Catherine(Plaintiff) | Dulka, Kurt(Plaintiff) Refers To: Mairs, Araceli(Defendant) | Mairs, Stephen(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE LAMDIEN THANH