This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 12:38:53 (UTC).

Kracke vs City of Santa Barbara

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 Kracke filed an Other lawsuit against City of Santa Barbara. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Respondent / Appellee

Kracke, Theodore P

Respondent and Appellant

City of Santa Barbara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

LOGUE, TRAVIS C

Respondent and Appellant Attorney

Calonne, Ariel Pierre

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Bifurcation; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:29 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:27 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 10:19 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 1:31 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 10:33 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Or Order filed by Kracke, Theodore P on 12/18/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketOrder Denying (Petitioner/Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs) filed by City of Santa Barbara on 12/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Description: and Costs; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM) heard 11/14/2019 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Description: and Costs; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Completion of Transcripts on Appeals VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketRecord on Appeal (Status CERTIFIED, version number 1) certified re appeal filed by City of Santa Barbara on 09/09/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
239 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (against Judge Vincent J O'Neill) filed by City of Santa Barbara on 12/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketTransfer In from Santa Barbara County. Original file date 11/30/16. Original case number 16CV05404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketCopy of Register of Actions from Santa Barbara County filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Transfer Venue) filed by Kracke, Theodore P on 12/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Allison Fore person authorized) filed by Kracke, Theodore P on 12/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketSummons issued on 12/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kracke, Theodore P on 12/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Kracke, Theodore P on 12/21/2016. Filed By: Kracke, Theodore P(Petitioner) Refers To: City of Santa Barbara(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less