This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 15:16:39 (UTC).

KPI Healthcare Inc vs. Karandeep Singh MD PC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 KPI Healthcare Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Karandeep Singh MD PC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

KPI Healthcare Inc

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Singh MD PC, Karandeep

Singh MD, Karandeep

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Bemis, Gary A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Alvarez, Justin M

LE, LAMDIEN T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (as to Cross-Complaint filed by Karandeep Singh MD PC 8-11-20) filed by Singh MD, Karandeep on 10/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by KPI Healthcare Inc on 10/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Limited Scope Representation (John S. Carter) filed by KPI Healthcare Inc on 09/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Singh MD PC, Karandeep on 08/11/2020. Filed By: Singh MD PC, Karandeep(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: KPI Healthcare Inc(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Singh MD PC, Karandeep; Singh MD, Karandeep on 08/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Karen M. Receptionist) filed by KPI Healthcare Inc on 07/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Karen M. Receptionist) filed by KPI Healthcare Inc on 07/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by KPI Healthcare Inc on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by KPI Healthcare Inc on 06/10/2020. Filed By: KPI Healthcare Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Singh MD, Karandeep(Defendant) | Singh MD PC, Karandeep(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KPI Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE LAMDIEN THANH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ JUSTIN MICHAEL