Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/10/2018 at 10:48:50 (UTC).

Klein vs. Nyamathi

Case Summary

On 01/22/2009 Klein filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Nyamathi. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Klein, Donna Lynn

Klein, Michael M

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bell Canyon Association

Nyamathi Family Trust a personal trust by and through its trustees Eswar Nyamathi and Adeline Nyamat

Nyamathi, Adeline

Nyamathi, Eswar

Nyamathi Family Trust a personal trust by and through its trustees Eswar Nyamathi and Adeline Nyamathi

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Nyamathi, Adeline

Nyamathi, Eswar

Nyamathi Family Trust a personal trust by and through its trustees Eswar Nyamathi and Adeline Nyamathi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewin, Rodney T.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Wright, Gabe P.

NEWMAN, CAROL L

MIRETSKY, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike Complaint; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 3:02 PM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
302 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2009
  • Motion for Preliminary Injunction (CLM) - scheduled for 03/19/2009 at 08:20:00 AM in S5 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Amount of 40.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 02/24/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • Motion - Other (for Preliminary Injunction) filed by Klein, Donna Lynn; Klein, Michael M on 02/18/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • Complaint - Amended (First Amended Compliaint) filed by Klein, Michael M; Klein, Donna Lynn on 02/19/2009. Filed By: Klein, Michael M(Plaintiff) | Klein, Donna Lynn(Plaintiff) Refers To: Nyamathi Family Trust a personal trust by and through its trustees Eswar Nyamathi and Adeline Nyamathi(Defendant) | Nyamathi, Eswar(Defendant) | Nyamathi, Adeline(Defendant) | Bell Canyon Association(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Proof of Service submitted by Klein, Donna Lynn; Klein, Michael M rejected on 02/18/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Signed by Reagan Boyce Attorney) filed by Klein, Michael M; Klein, Donna Lynn on 02/24/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Case assigned to Department S5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Klein, Michael M; Klein, Donna Lynn on 01/22/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Klein, Michael M; Klein, Donna Lynn on 01/22/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Complaint filed by Klein, Michael M; Klein, Donna Lynn on 01/22/2009. Filed By: Klein, Michael M(Plaintiff) | Klein, Donna Lynn(Plaintiff) Refers To: Nyamathi Family Trust a personal trust by and through its trustees Eswar Nyamathi and Adeline Nyamathi(Defendant) | Nyamathi, Eswar(Defendant) | Nyamathi, Adeline(Defendant) | Bell Canyon Association(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bell Canyon Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWMAN CAROL LINDA